Benton v. Payne et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Referred: | J Thomas Ray |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00893 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 10/20 12:01 PM
WRITTEN OBJECTIONS to4 Recommended Disposition by Rico Benton. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/05 9:58 AM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that2 Complaint filed by Rico Benton be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to state a claim; and that the dismissal count as a "STRIKE" for purposes of 28. U.S.C. § 1915(g). Objections due within 14 days of date of Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/5/2022. (csf) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Thu 09/29 10:09 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Cummins Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/29/2022. (ldb) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/28 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rico Benton. (llg) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 09/28 11:39 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rico Benton. (llg) |