United States v. Dawson
Original Case: 1:20-cr-00178
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cr-08064 |
Type | criminal / direct criminal |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 11:33 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellant
JERRY DARNELL DAWSON, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 22 2024
[11060934] Affirmed;Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published;. Judges Phillips, Baldock, author; and McHugh. Mandate to issue. [22-8064] |
Docket last updated: 09/29/2022 11:33 AM MDT |
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
[10943593] Entry of appearance submitted by Jonathan C. Coppom for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/27/2022 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] 22-8064 JCC | ||
[10943732] Entry of appearance submitted by Deborah L. Roden for Appellant Jerry Darnell Dawson, Jr. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/28/2022 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 09/27/2022] 22-8064 DLR | ||
[10943579] Criminal case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/27/2022. Docketing statement due 10/11/2022 for Jerry Darnell Dawson Jr.. Notice of appearance due on 10/11/2022 for Jerry Darnell Dawson Jr. and United States of America. Appellant's designation of record due 10/11/2022 for Jerry Darnell Dawson Jr.. Transcript order form due 10/11/2022 for Jerry Darnell Dawson Jr.. Appointment motion due 10/11/2022 by Jerry Darnell Dawson Jr. 22-8064 | ||
Att: 1 19 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Transmittal letter | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs General Docket Letter - With Counsel | ||
1 pgs [10943603] Entry of appearance filed by Jonathan C. Coppom for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. 22-8064 | ||
7 pgs [10943733] Docketing statement filed by Jerry Darnell Dawson, Jr.. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. 22-8064 DLR | ||
[10943734] Designation of record filed by Appellant Jerry Darnell Dawson, Jr.. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. 22-8064 DLR | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Docket Sheet Circled | ||
2 pgs [10943735] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Jerry Darnell Dawson, Jr.. Transcript ordered: Change of Plea held on 7/7/22, Sentencing held on 9/26/22. Served on: 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. 22-8064 DLR | ||
2 pgs [10943742] Entry of appearance filed by Mrs. Deborah Lynn Roden for Jerry Darnell Dawson, Jr.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 09/28/2022. Manner of Service: email 22-8064 |