USA v. Alvarez-Alvarado
Original Case: 4:22-cr-00235
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-dcrim-50853 |
Type | criminal (dcrim) / direct criminal |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 12:33 PM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Amado Alvarez-Alvarado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/29/2022 12:33 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
2 pgs DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Amado Alvarez-Alvarado 22-50853 (MVM) | ||
4 pgs JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW COMPLETE. Transcript order due on 10/13/2022 for Appellant Amado Alvarez-Alvarado 22-50853 (MVM) |