Criswell v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00895 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Defendant
Aldridge
|
|
Defendant
Allen
|
|
Defendant
Arce
|
|
Defendant
Callaway
|
|
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Harrison
|
|
Defendant
Harron
|
|
Defendant
Hendrix
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Horton
|
|
Defendant
Hunter
|
|
Defendant
Huskey
|
|
Defendant
Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Jones
|
|
Defendant
Lattimore
|
|
Defendant
Marshall
|
|
Defendant
Massadiaq
|
|
Defendant
Nelson
|
|
Defendant
Patello
|
|
Defendant
Reed
|
|
Defendant
Rose
|
|
Defendant
Sanders
|
|
Defendant
Stovall
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Defendant
Whitly
|
|
Defendant
Yakimoviez
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul Criswell
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Tue 03/14 3:32 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
18 | 18
order
Judgment 1983
Tue 03/14 3:29 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with17 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 03/14/2023. (llg) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/14 3:26 PM
ORDER approving and adopting15 Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Criswell's claims based on his failure to state a plausible constitutional claim for relief; recommending, in the future, this dismissal be considered a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); certifying an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith; and instructing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 03/14/2023. (llg) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 03/13 12:46 PM
OBJECTION to15 Recommended Disposition by Paul Criswell. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/28 1:38 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that14 Amended Complaint be dismissed, without prejudice; recommending that this dismissal be considered a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); recommending that the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation would not be taken in good faith; and recommending that the Clerk of the Court be directed to close this case. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 2/28/2023. (ldb) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/24 1:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul Criswell. (ldb) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 02/07 11:43 AM
ORDER granting12 motion for extension of time; allowing Mr. Criswell until 2/23/2023, to file his amended complaint in this lawsuit clarifying his constitutional claims as instructed by the Court in its4 10/21/2022 Order; and directing the Clerk to provide Mr. Criswell a blank section 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 2/7/2023. (jbh) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 02/06 4:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint re11 Order, by Paul Criswell. (ldb) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/04 3:01 PM
ORDER allowing Mr. Criswell until 2/3/2023, to file his amended complaint in this lawsuit clarifying his constitutional claims as instructed by the Court in its4 10/21/2022 Order; directing the Clerk to provide another copy of the4 October 21st Order to Mr. Criswell, along with a copy of this Order; and directing the Clerk to provide Mr. Criswell a blank section 1983 complaint form. If Mr. Criswell fails to file an amended complaint, the Court will screen his original complaint, which may result in the dismissal of his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 1/4/2023. (jbh) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/30 4:23 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Paul Criswell. (kdr) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Copies Order on Motion for Order
Mon 12/12 9:12 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Copies; the Clerk is directed to provide Mr. Criswell a copy of the docket sheet; granting8 Motion for Status Update. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/12/22. (tjb) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 12/08 2:14 PM
MOTION for Status Update by Paul Criswell. (ldb) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Copies
Thu 12/08 2:09 PM
MOTION for Copies by Paul Criswell. (ldb) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 11/28 11:17 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part5 motion to stay. Mr. Criswell may now have until 1/2/2023, to file his amended complaint. His failure to comply with this Court's Order may result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/28/2022. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Tue 11/22 4:07 PM
MOTION to Stay by Paul Criswell. (ldb) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Fri 10/21 12:17 PM
ORDER granting3 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility; allowing Mr. Criswell to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and instructing the Clerk to provide Mr. Criswell a blank 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/21/2022. (jbh) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/21 10:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Criswell. (llg) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 12:59 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, an IFP application; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 09/30/2022. (llg) (Docket text modified on 9/30/2022 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) |
|
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 09/30 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re2 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS" as marked on the document. (jak) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul Criswell.(kdr) |