Williams v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00899 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Willie Williams
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 12/07 1:26 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Willie Williams re3 Order,4 Judgment,5 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 10/31 12:15 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 10/31 12:09 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the3 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (jbh) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/31 12:06 PM
ORDER dismissing Mr. Williams' claims without prejudice due to a lack of prosecution; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (jbh) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 3:08 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS the Clerk is directed to enclose a new IFP application with a copy of this Order; plaintiff must return the completed IFP application or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/22. (tjb) |
|
misc
Docket Note
Fri 09/30 3:10 PM
Docket Note: complete IFP application mailed to plaintiff Willie Williams (tjb) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Willie Williams.(kdr) |