Fisher v. Skinner et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Patricia S Harris |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00944 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 10, 2022 |
Defendant
Emmer J Branch
|
|
Defendant
Louis C Skinner
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Fisher
|
Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago |
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Thu 11/10 11:52 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
8 | 8
order
Judgment 1983
Thu 11/10 11:49 AM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to7 Order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/10/2022. (llg) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 11/10 11:46 AM
ORDER approving and adopting, in their entirety,5 Proposed Findings and Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing, without prejudice, Fisher's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; counting dismissal of this action as a "strike" within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); and certifying an in forma pauperis appeal from the order adopting this recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/10/2022. (llg) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 11/07 4:54 PM
OBJECTION to5 Proposed Findings and Recommendation, by Steven Fisher. (ldb) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 10/14 1:54 PM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that:2 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice; dismissal of this action count as a "strike" within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); and that the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from the order adopting this recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/14/2022. (ldb) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 10/12 1:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Fisher. (ldb) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Thu 09/29 4:02 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Pine Bluff Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; directing Fisher to amend his complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order to more fully describe his claims and to explain how this case is different from the case previously dismissed; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a blank § 1983 complaint form to Fisher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/29/2022. (jbh) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/29 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Steven Fisher. (llg) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 09/29 12:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Fisher. (llg) |