JRI Properties LLC v. Boing US Holdco Inc
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00256 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Independence County Circuit Court, 32CV-22-00255 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 27, 2023 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Boing US Holdco Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JRI Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Fri 03/31 12:14 PM
JUDGMENT: JRI Properties's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction until 5/29/2023 to enforce the parties' settlement. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/31/2023. (jak) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 03/31 12:04 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The parties have informally notified the Court that they have settled. Congratulations. JRI Properties's amended complaint will be dismissed with prejudice, but the Court will retain jurisdiction for a time to enforce the parties' settlement. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/31/2023. (slb) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/10 12:46 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/16/2024 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 12/15/2023. Motions due by 2/15/2024. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/14/2024. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/10/2023. (slb) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order
Tue 01/10 12:42 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint 26(f) report, Doc. 17 , noted. The Court prefers its deadlines and regrets that the press of other Court business prevents an earlier trial date. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case probably could hold a trial sooner. The forms and instructions for consent jurisdiction are on the Court's website. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/2023. (slb) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 01/03 1:56 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by JRI Properties LLC. (Stroud, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 12/28 4:47 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, Doc. 15 , granted. Noah Watson is relieved as counsel of record for Boing US Holdco., Inc. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/28/2022. (slb) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 12/28 2:24 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Boing US Holdco Inc (Watson, Noah) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Tue 11/15 3:03 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/5/2023. Bench Trial set for 12/16/2024 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/15/2022. (slb) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 11/14 11:58 AM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Boing US Holdco Inc.(Watson, Noah) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/31 11:34 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Exhibits A-C attached against All Defendants, filed by JRI Properties LLC(Stroud, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits "A" through "C" | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/31 11:19 AM
DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (Stroud, Robert) (Docket text modified on 10/31/2022 to indicate the document was filed in error) (jak) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 10/31 10:47 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. 9 , granted for good cause. FED. R. CIV. P. 15(a)(2). Amended complaint due by 4 November 2022. Motion, Doc. 8 , denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/31/2022. (slb) |
|
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Mon 10/31 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re11 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error (missing exhibits). The correct document was filed by the filing party as docket entry12 Amended Complaint. (jak) |
||
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 10/11 2:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by JRI Properties LLC(Stroud, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" to Motion | ||
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 10/07 3:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs (Stroud, Robert) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Deficiency Letter
Thu 10/06 3:13 PM
Deficiency Letter notifying party that the Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with6 Answer to Complaint. See F.R.Cv.P. 7.1. (kbc) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/05 2:31 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Boing US Holdco Inc.(Watson, Noah) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 09/30 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 Notice of Removal,2 Complaint,4 Notice of Docket Correction. CORRECTION: The civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to1 Notice of Removal and is attached hereto for review by the parties. The docket text for docket entry2 was modified to indicate the civil cover sheet was filed as an attachment in error. The docket text for docket entry4 Notice of Docket Correction was modified to indicate the docket correction was filed in error. (jak) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Thu 09/29 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was not added during docketing due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. It was added to2 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Thu 09/29 8:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Boing US Holdco Inc identifying Corporate Parent Shine Acquisition Co. Ltd., Corporate Parent Rose MidCo Ltd., and Other Affiliate Driven Brands Holdings Inc. for Boing US Holdco Inc. (ldb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/29 8:32 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND MANDATORY INJUNCTION filed by JRI Properties LLC against Boing US Holdco Inc. (ldb) Additional attachment added on 9/29/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet. (kbc) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 09/29 8:29 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boing US Holdco Inc from Independence County Circuit Court, case number 32CV-22-255. Fee $402, receipt number LIT088441. (ldb) |