USA v. Dominguez Flores
Texas Western District Court | |
Case #: | 7:22-cr-00219 |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 30, 2022 2:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ivan Dominguez Flores (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/30/2022 3:02 AM CDT |
Tuesday, August 02, 2022 | ||
Arrest of Ivan Dominguez Flores (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | ||
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin as to Ivan Dominguez Flores (1). (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
2 | 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald C. Griffin:Initial Appearance as to Ivan Dominguez Flores held on 8/4/2022 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Midland.) (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
3 | 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Ivan Dominguez Flores Alvaro Martinez, Jr for Ivan Dominguez Flores appointed.. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
4 | 4 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Ivan Dominguez Flores Detention Hearing set for 8/9/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Ronald C. Griffin, Preliminary Hearing set for 8/9/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Ronald C. Griffin,. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
5 | 5 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Ivan Dominguez Flores. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
6 | 6 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Ivan Dominguez Flores. (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
Text Order GRANTING7 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Ivan Dominguez Flores (1) Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | ||
Attorney Alvaro Martinez, Jr terminated as to Ivan Dominguez Flores. (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Ivan Dominguez Flores. (Parras, Jeffrey) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
8 | 8 ORDER RESETTING as to Ivan Dominguez Flores, ( Detention Hearing reset for 8/9/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald C. Griffin,, Preliminary Hearing reset for 8/9/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald C. Griffin,). Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
Tuesday, August 09, 2022 | ||
9 | 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald C. Griffin:Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Ivan Dominguez Flores held on 8/9/2022 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR-Midland.) (jb3) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
10 | 10 EXHIBIT LIST as to Ivan Dominguez Flores(jb3) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
Att: 1 Sealed Pretrial Report | ||
11 | 11 ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to No Bond as to Ivan Dominguez Flores (1). Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
12 | 12 MOTION to Extend Time - CONTINUANCE OF GRAND JURY PRESENTMENT AND ORDER TOLLING SPEEDY TRIAL TIME COMPUTATION by Ivan Dominguez Flores. (Parras, Jeffrey) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Extend Time as to Ivan Dominguez Flores (1). Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (ms2) [7:22-mj-00212-RCG] | |
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Midland/Odessa Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Ivan Dominguez Flores. (jb3) | ||
14 | 14 INDICTMEN filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Ivan Dominguez Flores (1) count(s) 1. (jb3) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/29/2022) (kg). |