Perry v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00901 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevis Perry
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 12/07 1:20 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kevis Perry re3 Order,4 Judgment,5 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 10/31 11:54 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 10/31 11:50 AM
JUDGMENT consistent with3 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (jak) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/31 11:48 AM
ORDER dismissing without prejudice Mr. Perry's claims due to a lack of prosecution. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (jak) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 2:19 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS the Clerk is directed to enclose a new IFP application with a copy of this Order; plaintiff must return the completed IFP application or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/22. (tjb) |
|
misc
Docket Note
Fri 09/30 2:20 PM
Docket Note: complete IFP application mailed to plaintiff Kevin Perry (tjb) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 9:36 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevis Perry.(kdr) |