Bettger v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00904 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Bettger
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 11/29 1:33 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Aaron Bettger re5 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 11/08 11:21 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Aaron Bettger re3 Order,4 Judgment. (fjg) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Tue 11/01 11:31 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (kdr) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 10/31 11:54 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with3 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (kdr) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/31 11:47 AM
ORDER dismissing Mr. Bettger's claims, without prejudice due to a lack of prosecution; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (kdr) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 12:27 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, a new IFP application; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/2022. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aaron Bettger.(kdr) |