Cottrell v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00905 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Cottrell
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 12/07 1:16 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Tracy Cottrell re3 Order,4 Judgment,5 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 10/31 11:52 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 10/31 11:46 AM
JUDGMENT consistent with3 Order, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (jak) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/31 11:44 AM
ORDER dismissing without prejudice Mr. Cottrell's claims due to a lack of prosecution. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (jak) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 1:07 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, an IFP application; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 09/30/2022. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tracy Cottrell.(kdr) |