Johnson v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00913 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Timothy Johnson Sr
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Wed 11/02 11:04 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
7 | 7
order
Judgment 1983
Wed 11/02 10:59 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with6 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/02/2022. (llg) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 11/02 10:54 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL withdrawing the reference; granting5 Mr. Johnson's motion to dismiss; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Johnson's complaint; and vacating the portion of 10/21/2022 Order granting IFP and assessing the $350 statutory filing fee. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/02/2022. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Wed 11/02 8:57 AM
MOTION for Dismissal without Prejudice by Ronald Timothy Johnson, Sr. (kdr) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Fri 10/21 12:06 PM
ORDER granting3 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility; allowing Mr. Johnson to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and instructing the Clerk to provide Mr. Johnson a blank 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/21/2022. (jbh) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/21 9:17 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Timothy Johnson, Sr. (kdr) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 3:20 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, a new IFP application; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/2022. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ronald Timothy Johnson, Sr.(kdr) |