Seals v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00916 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Juaquawn Seals
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 10/31 2:35 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 10/31 1:35 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with3 Order, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (ldb) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/31 1:33 PM
ORDER dimissing, without prejudice, Mr. Seals' claims; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (ldb) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 2:35 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, an IFP application; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 09/30/2022. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Juaquawn Seals.(kdr) |