Thompson v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00921 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Alan Thompson
|
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Friday, December 09, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 12/09 10:57 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Alan Thompson re8 Order,9 Judgment,10 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (jbh) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 11/14 12:20 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
9 | 9
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 11/14 12:18 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with8 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/14/2022. (llg) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/14 12:16 PM
ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Thompson's claims due to a lack of prosecution. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/14/2022. (llg) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 10/21 11:28 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Alan Thompson re5 Order. (fjg) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 10/13 10:28 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Alan Thompson re1 Complaint. (fjg) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/07 12:37 PM
ORDER: If Mr. Thompson wants to pursue this case, he must notify the Court of his current address within 30 days. Failure to comply with this Order is likely to result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/7/2022. (jbh) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 10/07 10:21 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Alan Thompson re complete IFP application. (fjg) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 10/06 11:16 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Alan Thompson re2 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner Plaintiffs, Docket Note: complete IFP application mailed to plaintiff. (fjg) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 2:34 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS the Clerk is directed to enclose a new IFP application with a copy of this Order; plaintiff must return the completed IFP application or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/22. (tjb) |
|
misc
Docket Note
Fri 09/30 2:37 PM
Docket Note: complete IFP application mailed to plaintiff Alan Thompson (tjb) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 10:43 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alan Thompson.(kdr) |