Rice v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00922 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Travon Rice
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Thu 11/17 9:18 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
9 | 9
order
Judgment 1983
Thu 11/17 9:16 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with8 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/17/2022. (llg) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/17 9:14 AM
ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Rice's claims due to a lack of prosecution. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/17/2022. (llg) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 10/25 9:05 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Travon Rice re4 Order. (kth) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 10/13 10:25 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Travon Rice re2 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner-Plaintiffs, IFP application. (fjg) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 10/11 2:17 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Travon Rice re1 Complaint. (fjg) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/11 1:35 PM
ORDER directing Mr. Rice to notify the Court of his current address within 30 days, if he wants to pursue this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/11/2022. (kdr) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 10/07 10:34 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Travon Rice re2 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner-Plaintiffs. (fjg) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 2:32 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, a new IFP application; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/2022. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 10:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Travon Rice.(kdr) |