Bell v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00924 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Bell
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 11/28 11:40 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
6 | 6
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 11/28 11:37 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with5 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/28/2022. (llg) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/28 11:34 AM
ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Bell's complaint; recommending, in the future, this dismissal be considered a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); certifying an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith; and instructing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/28/2022. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Wed 10/19 3:00 PM
ORDER granting3 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility; allowing Mr. Bell to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and instructing the Clerk to provide Mr. Bell a blank 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/19/2022. (jbh) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 10/19 10:47 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron Bell. (llg) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 12:54 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, a new IFP application; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/2022. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aaron Bell.(kdr) |