Nance v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00925 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Tomlin Nance
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 11/28 11:49 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
6 | 6
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 11/28 11:47 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with5 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/28/2022. (llg) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/28 11:44 AM
ORDER withdrawing the reference; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Nance's complaint; recommending, in the future, this dismissal be considered a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); certifying an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith; and instructing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/28/2022. (llg) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Fri 10/21 12:13 PM
ORDER granting3 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility; allowing Mr. Nance to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and instructing the Clerk to provide Mr. Nance a blank 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/21/2022. (jbh) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/21 10:49 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tomlin Nance. (llg) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 2:08 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS the Clerk is directed to enclose a new IFP application with a copy of this Order; plaintiff must return the completed IFP application or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/22. (tjb) |
|
misc
Docket Note
Fri 09/30 2:10 PM
Docket Note: complete IFP application mailed to plaintiff Tomlin Nance (tjb) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tomlin Nance.(kdr) |