Brown v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00929 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Wilbur Brown Jr
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 12/13 1:42 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Wilbur Brown Jr re6 Judgment. (fjg) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 12/09 10:55 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Wilbur Brown Jr re5 Order,7 Appellate Filing Fee Notice,8 Notice of Docket Correction. (jbh) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Mon 11/28 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re7 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to7 docket entry and is attached hereto for service/review by the parties. (cmn) |
|
7 | 7
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 11/28 12:40 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) (cmn) |
|
Att: 1 (11/28/2022) Main Document - Correct | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 11/28 12:39 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with5 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/28/2022. (llg) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/28 12:36 PM
ORDER withdrawing the reference; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Brown's complaint; recommending, in the future, this dismissal be considered a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); certifying an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith; and instructing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/28/2022. (llg) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 10/24 10:47 AM
ORDER granting3 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility; allowing Mr. Brown 30 days within the entry of this Order to file an amended complaint; and directing the Clerk to provide Mr. Brown a blank 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/24/2022. (ldb) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/21 4:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wilbur Brown, Jr. (kdr) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 1:04 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, a new IFP application; and directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/2022. (ldb) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilbur Brown, Jr.(kdr) |