Meredith v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00931 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Nov 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Jayquan Meredith
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Tue 12/27 2:49 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
13 | 13
order
Judgment 1983
Tue 12/27 2:47 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with12 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/27/2022. (llg) |
|
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/27 2:43 PM
ORDER withdrawing the reference; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Meredith's complaint; recommending, in the future, this dismissal be considered a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); certifying an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith; and instructing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/27/2022. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 11/22 1:44 PM
ORDER granting9 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility; allowing Mr. Meredith to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and instructing the Clerk to provide Mr. Meredith a blank 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/22/2022. (ldb) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 11/21 3:09 PM
ORDER setting aside the order of dismissal and judgment entered on 10/31/2022; and referring the case back to U.S. Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin for consideration and determination of all pre-trial matters and for recommended disposition for the resolution of any dispositive matters. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/21/2022. (jbh) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 11/18 12:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jayquan Meredith. (jbh) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 11/18 12:29 PM
NOTICE by Jayquan Meredith. (jbh) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 11/07 9:57 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied on the basis that it was untimely filed. This case has been dismissed and is closed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/07/2022. (dpb) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 11/04 2:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jayquan Meredith. (kdr) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 10/31 2:20 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (kdr) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 10/31 1:51 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with3 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (kdr) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/31 1:46 PM
ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Meredith's claims due to a lack of prosecution; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (kdr) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 1:55 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS the Clerk is directed to enclose a new IFP application with a copy of this Order; plaintiff must return the completed IFP application or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/22. (tjb) |
|
misc
Docket Note
Fri 09/30 1:57 PM
Docket Note: complete IFP application mailed to plaintiff Jayquan Meredith (tjb) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jayquan Meredith.(kdr) |