Spann v. National Conference of Bar Examiners, et al
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00709
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02117 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 11, 2022 1:44 AM MST |
Defendant
VICTORIA GARCIA, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CARLA C. MARTINEZ, ESQ., individually and as a Former Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BONNIE STEPLETON, ESQ., individually and as a Former Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KEVIN FITZWATER, ESQ., individually and as a Former Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HOWARD THOMAS, individually and as Executive Director, The New Mexico Board of Law Examiners
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CYNTHIA LOVATO-FARMER, ESQ, individually and as Chair, The New Mexico Board of Bar Examiners
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NAN NASH, ESQ., individually and as Vice Chair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATEO PAGE, ESQ., individually and as Vice Chair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HENRY ALANIZ, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ARI BIERNOFF, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SHAMMARA HALEY HENDERSON, ESQ, individually and as a Former Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARGARET A. GRAHAM, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TORRI JACOBUS, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROSALYN NGUYEN, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DYLAN O'REILLY, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OLGA SERAFIMOV, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LUCINDA R. SILVA, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BARBARA VIGIL, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CONCEPCION FLORES, ESQ., individually and as a Member
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SOPHIE MARTIN, ESQ., individually and as a Director of Communications, Education, and Outreach
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KEVIN D. HAMMAR, ESQ, individually and as Former Vice Chair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE NEW MEXICO BOARD OF BAR EXAMINERS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
THE NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF BAR EXAMINERS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARILYN J. WELLINGTON, ESQ., individually and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
THE NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF BAR EXAMINERS BOARD OF TRUSTEES AN OFFICERS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
SUZANNE K. RICHARDS, ESQ., individually and as a Chair and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HULETT H. ASKEW, ESQ., individually and as an Immediate Past Chair and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TIMOTHY Y. WONG, ESQ., individually and as a Chair-Elect and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN J. MCALARY, ESQ., Individually and as a Secretary and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JUDITH GUNDERSEN, ESQ., individually and as the President/CEO and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT BALES, ESQ., individually and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ARLENE Y. COLEMAN, ESQ., individually and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SOLOMON OLIVER, JR., ESQ., individually and as an Officer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
AUGUSTIN RIVERA, JR., ESQ., individually and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DARIN B. SCHEER, ESQ., individually and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ANTHONY R. SIMON, ESQ., individually and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ANN A. SCOTT TIMMER, ESQ., individually and as an Officer and as a Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARILYN J. WELLINGTON, ESQ., individually and as an Officer and as a
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SOPHIE MARTIN, ESQ., individually and as a Director of Communications, Education, and Outreach
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BRAD GILBERT, ESQ., individually and as General Counsel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DOCTOR PERRY SPANN
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 09 2022
[10954072] Frap 42 procedural termination without judicial action by the Clerk of the Court. [22-2117] |
Docket last updated: 11/11/2022 1:44 AM MST |
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
[10943840] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/27/2022. Fee is due by 10/12/2022 for Perry Spann. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/12/2022 for Perry Spann. Notice of appearance due on 10/12/2022 for Hulett H. Askew, Scott Bales, Arlene Y. Coleman, Brad Gilbert, Judith Gundersen, Sophie Martin, John J. McAlary, National Conference of Bar Examiners, Solomon Oliver Jr., Suzanne K. Richards, Augustin Rivera Jr., Darin B. Scheer, Anthony R. Simon, Ann A. Scott Timmer, Marilyn J. Wellington and Timothy Y. Wong. 22-2117 | ||
Att: 1 41 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |