Greene v. Greyhound Lines
Original Case: 1:22-cv-01111
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01314 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 18, 2022 2:31 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
GREYHOUND LINES, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CEDRIC GREENE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 17 2022
[10948054] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action. Clerk of Court. [22-1314] |
Docket last updated: 10/18/2022 2:32 AM MDT |
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
[10943895] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/28/2022 22-1314 | ||
Att: 1 9 pgs Preliminary ROA | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se | ||
1 pgs [10943993] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Mr. Greene is subject to filing restrictions. On or before 10/12/2022 the appellant shall file all documents required by the filing restrictions. Failure to comply in any way with the restriction requirements within the time stated will result in the dismissal of this appeal without further notice. Served on 09/28/2022. 22-1314 |