Lartigue v. Northside Indep
Original Case: 5:19-cv-00393
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cr-50854 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2023 3:14 PM CST |
Amicus Curiae
Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Northside Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kaylee Lartigue
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 16 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-50854 Vacated and Remanded] Judge: PEH , Judge: JES , Judge: JWE. Mandate issue date is 12/08/2023 [22-50854] |
Docket last updated: 11/17/2023 3:14 PM CST |
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Kaylee Lartigue 22-50854 (AS) |