Turner v. Bd of Suprs Univ of LA
Original Case: 2:21-cv-00664
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cr-30615 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 10, 2023 3:30 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Steven H. Kenny, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Doctor Keri Turner
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 09 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-30615 Affirmed ] Judge: WED , Judge: LHS , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 08/31/2023 [22-30615] |
Docket last updated: 08/10/2023 3:30 AM CDT |
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
1 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Keri Turner 22-30615 (WMJ) |