Dill v. Social Security Administration
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lee P Rudofsky |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00948 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2024 |
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Fri 01/05 1:11 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with20 Order, the Commissioner's decision is affirmed, and judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/5/2024. (ldb) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 01/05 1:08 PM
ORDER approving and adopting18 Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings and conclusions in all respects; and affirming the Commissioner's decision. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/5/2024. (ldb) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 09/26 10:44 PM
OBJECTION to18 Report and Recommendations by Tonya Renee Dill (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/17 11:19 AM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the Court affirm the decision and enter judgment in favor of the Commissioner. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 7/17/2023. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Defendant's Brief (Social Security)
Wed 04/19 10:07 AM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration. (Coleman, Bert) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/11 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Plaintiff's Brief (Social Security)
Fri 03/31 2:12 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Tonya Renee Dill. Defendant Brief due by 5/1/2023(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement MER Abstract | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/21 11:37 AM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (kdr) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/01 9:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's answer, accompanied by a certified copy of the administrative record, or responsive pleading is due 60 days after notice of this case. Plaintiff's brief is due 30 days after the answer is filed. Failing to file a timely brief may result in dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute. Defendant's brief is due 30 days after Plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief is due 14 days after Defendant's brief is filed. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/1/2023. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Administrative Transcript (Social Security)
Tue 02/28 12:49 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re10 Answer to Complaint filed by Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Consent Notice
Tue 02/28 11:24 AM
NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (jbh) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/27 6:40 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Preston, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Tue 02/14 5:54 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting8 Defendant's Motion to Substitute Attorney. Accordingly, Ms. Shannon Smith is substituted as counsel and Ms. Stacey McCord is relieved as counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 02/14/23. (dmm) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Substitute Attorney
Tue 02/14 9:31 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Social Security Administration (Smith, Shannon) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 12/20 3:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonya Renee Dill. Social Security Administration served on 10/26/2022. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 12/15 8:58 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Defendant's answer and a certified copy of the administrative record must be filed by Monday, February 27, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/15/22. (dmm) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 12/14 3:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint by Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/12 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Preston on behalf of Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/03 9:31 AM
ORDER granting1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk to issue Summons, without prepayment of fees and costs, to Plaintiff's counsel, who is responsible for service of the Complaint and Summons in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/3/2022. (jbh) |
|
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 10/03 9:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jbh) |
||
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/30 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Tonya Renee Dill against Social Security Administration. (ldb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 09/30 1:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tonya Renee Dill. (ldb) |