James v. PMG OPCO-Washington
Original Case: 5:21-cv-02407
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-pcf-30618 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2023 3:28 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
PMG OPCO-Washington, L.L.C,, doing business as Booker T. Washington Skilled Nursing & Rehabilitation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Kourtney Brownlee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
PMG OPCO-Washington, L.L.C., doing business as Booker T. Washington Skilled Nursing & Rehabilitation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Tola Mae James, Individually and on behalf of John Henry James Estate
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Johnetta Coleman, Individually and on behalf of John Henry James Estate
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Angela Jackson, Individually and on behalf of John Henry James Estate
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/12/2023 3:28 AM CDT |
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Kourtney Brownlee and PMG OPCO-Washington, L.L.C, 22-30618 (AGL) |