Krishna v. Life Ins Company
Original Case: 4:21-cv-01813
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-pcf-20516 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 25, 2023 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Honeywell International, Incorporated Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Honeywell International, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Steven Jacobs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Honeywell International, Incorporated Benefit Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Deepa Krishna
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 21 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-20516 Affirmed ] Judge: JLW , Judge: LHS , Judge: SKD. Mandate issue date is 08/14/2023 [22-20516] |
Docket last updated: 07/25/2023 3:35 AM CDT |
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Deepa Krishna. 22-20516 (CAG) |