Benteler Automotive v. Allied Plstc
Original Case: 5:16-cv-00238
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-pcd-40654 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 24, 2023 3:27 AM CDT |
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
Allied Plastics, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
Forming Technologies, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
Packaging Concepts & Design, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff - Appellant
Benteler Automotive Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff - Appellant
Benteler Automotive-Mexico
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 23 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-40654 Affirmed ] Judge: JWE , Judge: JCH , Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 06/14/2023 [22-40654] |
Docket last updated: 05/24/2023 3:27 AM CDT |
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Benteler Automotive Corporation, Benteler Automotive-Mexico, Allied Plastics, Incorporated, Forming Technologies, L.L.C. and Packaging Concepts & Design, L.L.C. in 22-40654 Update: Correction. 22-40654 (CCR) | ||
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Benteler Automotive Corporation and Benteler Automotive-Mexico 22-40654 (CCR) |