Bradley v. Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Billy Roy Wilson |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00953 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Defendant
Doe
|
|
Defendant
Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
|
|
Plaintiff
Broderick Armon Bradley
|
GPO
Nov 30 2022
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 12 Order, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/30/2022. (ldb) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 12/07 1:09 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Broderick Armon Bradley re9 Recommended Disposition. Previously resent to updated address. (fjg) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Wed 11/30 3:09 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb) |
|
13 | 13
order
Judgment 1983
Wed 11/30 1:48 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with12 Order, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/30/2022. (ldb) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 11/30 1:36 PM
ORDER granting9 Report and Recommendations. Mr. Bradleys complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice, based on his failure to state a plausible constitutional claim for relief. The Court recommends that, in the future, this dismissal be considered a strike for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/30/22. (mmb) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 11/29 1:34 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Broderick Armon Bradley re8 Order. Previously resent to updated address. (fjg) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 11/17 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Broderick Armon Bradley. (kdr) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 11/09 3:15 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Mr. Bradley's complain be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a plausible constitutional claim for relief; this dismissal be considered a "strike" and an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith; the Clerk be instructed to close this case2 ; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/9/22. (tjb) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Wed 11/09 2:39 PM
ORDER granting7 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/9/2022. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 11/02 3:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Broderick Armon Bradley. (ldb) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/24 1:33 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Order; instructing the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to the Sheriff/Jail Administrator for the Pulaski County Detention Facility; instructing Mr. Bradley to promptly notify the Court if he continues to have problems with Detention Facility officials completing his IFP application; and denying5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as incomplete. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/24/2022. (ldb) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/21 4:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Broderick Armon Bradley. (ldb) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
motion
Order
Fri 10/21 4:44 PM
MOTION for Order by Broderick Armon Bradley. (ldb) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/03 1:30 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, a new IFP application; and directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/3/2022. (ldb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/03 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Broderick Armon Bradley. (llg) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/03 12:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Broderick Armon Bradley. (llg) |