Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:William E Cassady
Referred: William E Cassady
Case #: 1:22-cv-00391
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 6:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By
Christopher John Zulanas
Friedman, Dazzio, Zulanas & Bowling, P.C.
contact info
Kelsey Reckart
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas
contact info
Plaintiff
Greg Brown
Represented By
Jon David Roberts, Jr.
Citrin Law Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Dill Brown
Represented By
Jon David Roberts, Jr.
Citrin Law Firm, PC
contact info

GPO Apr 17 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/17/2024. (mab)

Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Friday, November 08, 2024
91 91 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/08 7:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Zulanas, Christopher)
Related: [-]