Montgomery v. Social Security Administration
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia S Harris |
Referred: | Patricia S Harris |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00257 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2023 |
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Docketing Letter
Thu 10/05 4:57 PM
USCA Docketing Letter and Scheduling Order as to18 Notice of Appeal filed by Shannon Montgomery. USCA Case Number 23-3226 (jbh) |
|
20 | 20
appeal
Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
Thu 10/05 12:11 PM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to18 Notice of Appeal re16 Order,17 Judgment. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS SHOULD BE FILED WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERK. (jbh) |
|
19 | 19
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal
Thu 10/05 10:21 AM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Shannon Montgomery re18 Notice of Appeal (Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 10/05 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to17 Judgment - SSA Consent, Order on Memorandum Order - SSA Consent,16 Memorandum Order - SSA Consent by Shannon Montgomery. (Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - SSA Consent Order on Memorandum Order - SSA Consent
Wed 10/04 9:32 AM
JUDGMENT pursuant to16 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/4/2023. (jak) |
|
16 | 16
12
pgs
motion
Memorandum Order - SSA Consent
Wed 10/04 9:30 AM
ORDER affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/4/2023. (jak) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Defendant's Brief (Social Security)
Fri 03/17 7:08 AM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration. (McEvoy, Meghan) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/17 7:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan McEvoy on behalf of Social Security Administration (McEvoy, Meghan) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Plaintiff's Brief (Social Security)
Fri 02/17 10:27 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Shannon Montgomery. Defendant Brief due by 3/20/2023 (Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Thu 02/16 12:48 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Shannon S. Smith for Social Security Administration. Attorney Stacey Elise McCord terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 02/16/2023.(jfc) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Substitute Attorney
Thu 02/16 10:19 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Social Security Administration (Smith, Shannon) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 01/13 10:00 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting9 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff Shannon Montgomery has filed the pending unopposed motion for extension of time to file a brief. For good cause shown, the motion is granted. Plaintiff is given up to, and including, February 17, 2023, to file his brief. The brief from the Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is due forty-two days from the filing of plaintiffs brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 01/13/2023. (jfc) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extend Time
Thu 01/12 1:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time by Shannon Montgomery (Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Administrative Transcript (Social Security)
Thu 12/15 1:18 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings filed by Social Security Administration(McCord, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment, | ||
Att: 6 Attachment, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment, | ||
Att: 8 Attachment, | ||
Att: 9 Attachment, | ||
Att: 10 Attachment, | ||
Att: 11 Attachment, | ||
Att: 12 Attachment, | ||
Att: 13 Attachment, | ||
Att: 14 Attachment, | ||
Att: 15 Attachment, | ||
Att: 16 Attachment, | ||
Att: 17 Attachment, | ||
Att: 18 Attachment, | ||
Att: 19 Attachment, | ||
Att: 20 Attachment | ||
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/14 12:32 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Preston, Sarah) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/14 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Preston on behalf of Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 11/17 10:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shannon Montgomery. Social Security Administration served on 10/26/2022.(Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
order
Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
Fri 10/14 8:59 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/14/2022. (ljb) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 10/04 10:48 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Shannon Montgomery has filed a pleading that the Clerk of the Court has construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court has reviewed the motion and finds that it should be, and is, granted. Plaintiff may proceed without the prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/04/2022. (jfc) |
|
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 10/04 1:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (wbb) |
||
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/03 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Shannon Montgomery against Social Security Administration.(wbb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/03 3:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shannon Montgomery. (wbb) |