Allen v. USA
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00183 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2024 |
Defendant
USA
|
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Allen
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 10:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Marcus Allen. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 03/19 10:28 AM
ORDER of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Marcus Allen: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (jbh) |
|
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 03/19 10:23 AM
ORDER of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Marcus Allen: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 4/9/2024, an order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (jbh) |
|
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Docketing Letter
Tue 03/19 10:21 AM
USCA Docketing Letter as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Marcus Allen. USCA Case Number 24-1565 (jbh) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
Mon 03/18 12:11 PM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to19 Notice of Appeal re17 Order,18 Judgment. (jbh) |
|
19 | 19
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 03/18 12:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to17 Order,18 Judgment by Marcus Allen. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Tue 03/05 1:58 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to17 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The relief requested is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/5/2024. (ldb) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Intervene Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Relief Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/05 1:53 PM
ORDER adopting2 Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law in all respects; dismissing, without prejudice,1 Mr. Allen's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying the relief sought; declining to issue a certificate of appealability; and denying as moot7 -10 ,12 -13] all pending motions. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/5/2024. (ldb) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/27 11:00 AM
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the judgment of 11/27/2023 re14 USCA Mandamus Letter. (jbh) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/27 10:54 AM
USCA JUDGMENT re14 USCA Mandamus Letter: Petition for writ of mandamus has been considered by the court and is denied. The motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is denied as moot. (jbh) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Mandamus Letter
Mon 11/27 10:48 AM
USCA Docketing Letter. Petition for Writ of Mandamus has been filed and assigned case number 23-3390 (jbh) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 09/28 1:21 PM
MOTION for Immediate Release by Marcus Allen. (llg) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Declaratory Judgment Relief
Thu 09/14 3:41 PM
MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and MOTION for Relief, by Marcus Allen. (ldb) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Declaratory Judgment Summary Judgment
Thu 06/15 2:15 PM
MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Motion for Summary Judgment by Marcus Allen. (kdr) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/09 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge to a Statute and Motion to Intervene by Marcus Allen. (kdr) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
24
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 04/25 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge to Statue and Motion to Intervene by Marcus Allen. (kdr) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 04/25 4:04 PM
MOTION to Court Clerk by Marcus Allen. (kdr) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
brief
Brief in Support
Wed 02/08 2:29 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marcus Allen. (kdr) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Brief (non-appeal)
Thu 01/05 11:09 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Marcus Allen. (ldb) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Brief (non-appeal)
Mon 11/21 2:17 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Marcus Allen. (ldb) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 11/10 4:49 PM
OBJECTION to2 Report and Recommendations by Marcus Allen. (kdr) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 10/07 1:37 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; and that a Certificate of Appealability be denied. Objections due within 14 days of the entry of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/7/2022. (ldb) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 10/03 4:01 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marcus Allen. (Filing fee of $5 paid, receipt number LIT088501.) (llg) |