Coulston v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03425 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 02, 2023 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
William Coulston
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/29 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 10/4/2022), Coulston v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3425-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/05 10:21 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 10/05 10:22 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 10/4/2022), Coulston v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3425-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/05 10:20 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10732498.), filed by William Coulston. Service due by 1/3/2023(sshe, ) |