Baker v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03431 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 02, 2023 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Does 1 to 100
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Baker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 11/02 8:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jonathan Baker(Shafer, Jeremy) Filing corrected for event type (not a Motion); Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions per CMO No 1. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-03431-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 10/4/2022), Baker v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3431-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern North Carolina (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/05 10:26 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 10/05 10:27 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 10/4/2022), Baker v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3431-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern North Carolina (sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/05 10:26 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10732996.), filed by Jonathan Baker. Service due by 1/3/2023(sshe, ) |