Maaske v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-05738 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Nebraska, 4:22-cv-03212 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2023 1:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alton Maaske
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago |
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Alton Maaske] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Alton Maaske] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Alton Maaske] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alton Maaske. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023. (Kassan, Randi) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 4:22-cv-03212. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 10/05 12:24 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 16-md-2741: Nebraska, 4 22-3212 Maaske v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-5738 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 355 cc: JPMDL (lsk, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Case transferred to District of USDC - Northern District of California. Original electronic file sent. (LKO) | ||
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES) | |
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |