Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Lee P Rudofsky
Case #: 4:22-cv-00961
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2022
Terminated:Oct 26, 2022
Case in other court:Jefferson County Circuit Court, 35CV-22-00664
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2023 4:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Lowes Home Centers LLC
Represented By
Brittany S. Ford
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Thomas G. Williams
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Bass, Jr
3603 Missouri Street
Pine Bluff, AR 71601


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
utility Notice of Docket Correction Wed 10/26 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to "Stipulation of Dismissal" as indicated on the document and pursuant to instruction from chambers. (kbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/25 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lowes Home Centers LLC (Ford, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
7 7 order Initial Scheduling Order Wed 10/12 11:43 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/27/2022 and Jury Trial set for 1/9/2024 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/12/2022. (hml)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/12 11:40 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 10/12/2022. (hml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/06 11:53 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Ford, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 10/05 4:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Lowes Home Centers LLC (Ford, Brittany)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Deficiency Letter Wed 10/05 4:34 PM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of the Court re1 Notice of Removal notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (ldb)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/05 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT filed by James Bass, Jr against Lowes Home Centers LLC. (ldb)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs notice Notice of Removal Wed 10/05 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowes Home Centers LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 35CV-22-664. Fee $402, receipt number LIT088541. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet