Florida Southern District Court
Judge:K Michael Moore
Referred: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Case #: 1:22-cv-23250
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2022
Terminated:Dec 21, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 04, 2023 5:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Sterling Infosystems, Inc.
Represented By
Kimberly A. Carabotta
Seyfarth
contact info
Mediator
Honorable Diane M. Welsh
1717 Arch Street Suite 3810
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Plaintiff
Fernandez Forestal
Represented By
Marc Reed Edelman
Morgan & Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 12/21 11:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon the Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice, which the Court construes as a notice of voluntary dismissal.15 . Rule 41(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure allows a plaintiff to voluntarily dismiss a claim prior to a defendant's filing of an answer or a motion for summary judgment, or after an answer has been filed where the dismissal bears the signatures of both parties. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). In this case, an answer has been filed, and the Stipulation of Dismissal bears the signature of counsel for both Parties per Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Stipulation, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the above-styled cause is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/21/2022. (fpi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 12/20 5:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Sterling Infosystems, Inc. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 12/01 11:15 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Action Pending Mediation13 . Therein, the Parties jointly request a stay of 90 days to conduct an additional mediation during the last week of February. See id. at 12. "A federal district court has broad discretion in granting or denying a stay and its decision will not be disturbed absent an abuse of discretion." SEC v. Incendy, 936 F. Supp. 952, 955 (S.D. Fla. 1996). The moving party bears the burden of showing good cause and reasonableness for staying proceedings. Feldman v. Flood, 176 F.R.D. 651, 652 (M.D. Fla. 1997) (citing Howard v. Galesi, 107 F.R.D. 348, 350 (S.D.N.Y.1985)). Here, the Parties do not advance any arguments for why a stay is warranted in this case. Considering that mediation has already been required by both this Court and Local Rule 16.2, the Court does not view staying the case for an already-existing obligation of the parties as advantageous or promoting expeditious resolution. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Parties' Motion13 is DENIED. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/1/2022. (fpi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
13 13 motion Stay Wed 11/30 4:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Action Pending Mediation by Fernandez Forestal. Responses due by 12/14/2022 (Edelman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
12 12 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 11/22 5:52 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Diane M. Welsh as Mediator. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
order Scheduling Order Tue 11/08 9:52 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN MIAMI. This case is now set for trial commencing the two-week trial period of July 3, 2023, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 13-1, (thirteenth floor) United States Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on June 29, 2023, at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for June 20, 2023, at 11 a.m. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. The Parties are hereby notified that this Court requires strict compliance with Local Rule 56.1 regarding the filing of any motion for summary judgment and corresponding statements of material facts. For evidence not previously filed on the docket, and to the extent practicable, evidentiary support for a Party's statement of material facts shall be filed as separate exhibits within the Court's electronic case filing system; the first citation to any evidence in support of a motion for summary judgment or statement of material facts shall provide the docket entry for that evidence using the form "ECF No." In all circumstances, citations to any composite exhibit shall provide both the page number assigned by the Court's electronic case filing system (i.e., the page number of the PDF) and the page number of the document. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be completed one hundred thirty (130) days prior to the date of trial. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. THE FILING BY COUNSEL OF A "NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY" BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE IS NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE LOCAL RULES AND SHALL NOT BE PRESUMED TO ALTER OR MODIFY THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/8/2022. (fpi)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 11/08 9:54 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for the two-week trial period beginning July 3, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. The parties shall agree upon a place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties and file a Notice of Scheduling Mediation no later than one hundred and ten (110) days prior to the scheduled trial date. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party or representatives of each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. The mediation shall take place in person absent good cause shown by the parties. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/8/2022. (fpi)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
9 9 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 11/07 5:48 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by Sterling Infosystems, Inc.(Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 03, 2022
8 8 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 11/03 3:42 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 10/11 9:05 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.6 . Therein, Defendant requests a twenty-one (21) day extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint,1 , to further investigate and respond to the allegations contained in the pleading. See6 at 12. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion6 is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint1 on or before November 3, 2022. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/10/2022. (fpi)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 10/07 11:19 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Sterling Infosystems, Inc..(Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Pretrial Order Fri 10/07 10:06 AM
PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. The parties shall seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three (3) days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/7/2022. (fpi)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/07 10:08 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAUREN F. LOUIS. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/7/2022. (fpi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/06 3:38 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterling Infosystems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sterling Intermediate Corp, Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Sterling Ultimate Parent Corp. for Sterling Infosystems, Inc. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 10/06 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Fernandez Forestal, on behalf of himself and on behalf of others similarly situated v. Sterling Infosystems, Inc.) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16004144, filed by Sterling Infosystems, Inc..(Carabotta, Kimberly) Modified Text on 10/6/2022 (cds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 10/06 3:29 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
Related: [-]