Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:22-cv-04009
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2022
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2023 6:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Mark Grady Miles
Represented By
Caitlin Lentz
Hamil Little PC
contact info
Kevin S. Little
Hamil Little PC
contact info
Defendant
Phillip Edward Miles
Plaintiff
Arvest Bank
Represented By
Leslie Pineyro
Jones & Walden LLC
contact info

GPO Sep 18 2023
OPINION and ORDER: Dr. Miles' Motion to Dismiss 8 is GRANTED. The claims against Dr. Miles (Counts Five through Eight) are DISMISSED without prejudice to being reasserted in a court with proper jurisdiction. Arvest's Motion to Transfer 10 is DENIED. Arvest and Phillip Miles are ORDERED to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference within 14 days from the date of this Order, and to serve initial disclosures and to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan within 30 days from the date of this Order. Discovery will commence 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/18/2023. (tht)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, March 28, 2024
31 31 1 pgs misc Judgment - Clerk Thu 03/28 7:42 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Mark Grady Miles against Plaintiff DISMISSING Defendant. (tas)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 03/28 7:18 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING30 Stipulation of Dismissal, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/28 7:19 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
30 30 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/27 9:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 12/12 3:43 PM
ORDER: Motion to extension of discovery period29 GRANTED. Discovery shall close on February 16, 2024. Dispositive motions must be filed by March 18, 2024. If a dispositive motion is not filed, the Consolidated Pre-Trial Order must be filed by April 1, 2024, otherwise the Consolidated Pre-Trial Order will be due 30 days after the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/12/2023. (slc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/11 12:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Joint Motion of Plaintiff and Defendant Phillip Edward Miles for Limited Extension of Discovery Period and Other Deadlines) by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
28 28 5 pgs motion Amend Tue 11/28 4:12 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint,, to Dismiss Count One and Count Two Without Prejudice by Arvest Bank.(Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Order
Friday, November 24, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/24 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George Brian Raley on behalf of Phillip Edward Miles (Raley, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Thu 11/16 5:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, Font & Margins) by Arvest Bank.(Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Mon 11/13 11:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Arvest Bank.(Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
24 24 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 10/06 5:33 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
23 23 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Change Venue Mon 09/18 3:33 PM
OPINION and ORDER: Dr. Miles' Motion to Dismiss8 is GRANTED. The claims against Dr. Miles (Counts Five through Eight) are DISMISSED without prejudice to being reasserted in a court with proper jurisdiction. Arvest's Motion to Transfer10 is DENIED. Arvest and Phillip Miles are ORDERED to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference within 14 days from the date of this Order, and to serve initial disclosures and to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan within 30 days from the date of this Order. Discovery will commence 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/18/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 09/18 2:48 PM
Clerk's Notation re22 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Docket reviewed; no conflicts identified. (kmj)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/18 3:35 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Phillip Edward Miles re23 Order. (tht)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
22 22 8 pgs misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/05 10:55 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Phillip Edward Miles. (tht)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
misc Remark Sun 08/27 4:17 PM
Remark re4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement,21 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Docket reviewed; no conflicts identified. (kmj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
21 21 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/23 8:55 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Mark Grady Miles. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 08/18 1:54 PM
ORDER: Defendant Phillip Edward Miles and counsel for Defendant Mark Grady Miles are hereby ORDERED to file the Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement required by Local Rule 3.3 within 10 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 08/18/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
19 19 misc Leave of Absence Thu 05/18 5:24 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 5-7, 10-13, 25-28, August 1-2, 2023, by Kevin S. Little. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
18 18 misc Leave of Absence Fri 01/27 12:40 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/16/2023, 5/17/2023, 5/18/2023, 5/19/2023, 6/12/2023, 6/13/2023, 6/14/2023, 7/5/2023, 7/6/2023, 7/7/2023, 7/8/2023, 7/9/2023, 7/10/2023, by Leslie Pineyro. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/06 11:33 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Change Venue of Claims Raised in Complaint Only as to Claims Against Defendant Mark Grady Miles filed by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 12/01 2:21 PM
Submission of10 MOTION to Change Venue of Claims Raised in Complaint Only as to Claims Against Defendant Mark Grady Miles, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (slc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
16 16 misc Leave of Absence Mon 11/28 11:10 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 23, 2022 - January 2, 2022, by Leslie Pineyro. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 26, 2022
15 15 misc Leave of Absence Sat 11/26 10:31 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): February 3, 16-17, 20-21, April 3-7, 10-11, 28, and May 22-26, 29, 2023, by Kevin S. Little. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2022
14 14 respm Reply Brief Fri 11/25 5:01 PM
REPLY BRIEF re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Grady Miles. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/25 4:59 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Change Venue of Claims Raised in Complaint Only as to Claims Against Defendant Mark Grady Miles filed by Mark Grady Miles. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/22 12:31 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Phillip Edward Miles. Discovery ends on 4/20/2023.(gas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification
Saturday, November 12, 2022
utility Submission to District Judge Sat 11/12 11:27 PM
Submission of8 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (slc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
11 11 respm Response to Motion Thu 11/10 11:36 AM
RESPONSE re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Change Venue Thu 11/10 11:34 AM
MOTION to Change Venue of Claims Raised in Complaint Only as to Claims Against Defendant Mark Grady Miles by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
9 9 misc Affidavit Wed 11/02 1:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service Upon Phillip Edward Miles by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 10/31 10:52 AM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Mark Grady Miles.(Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
7 7 notice Certificate of Compliance Tue 10/25 11:18 AM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Mon 10/17 10:38 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/12/2022. (jra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
5 5 misc Affidavit Tue 10/11 4:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 10/07 10:38 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Arvest Bank. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 10/06 9:11 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Mark Grady Miles. (gas)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 10/06 9:11 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Phillip Edward Miles. (gas)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/06 9:10 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Arvest Bank. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12113126)(gas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet