Lemke et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03474 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2022 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:22-cv-07731 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2023 5:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor ininterest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Mark Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert J. Lemke
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Danny Oatis
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derek Strand
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Nord
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shane Miller
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Melendez
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Detective Brandon Watson
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin McKeever
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick McIntyre
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lars Martin Maeland
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Owen
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Smith
Terminated: 01/24/2023
#71109-004 FCI Williamsburg PO Box 340
Salters, SC 29590 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Courtemanche
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Watson
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harvey Szczepan
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. James Walker
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Vazquez
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Truxillo
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Troxel
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Fick
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cora Adams
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joey Adams
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Austin
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Blanchard
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reginald Braxton
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Bryant
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Bursiaga
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Charles
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Cortez Jr.
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debby Farrar
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lonnie Ellis
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lewis Love
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Garrett
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tomas Gonzalez
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Gouthro
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Hallmark
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clyde Holliday
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Hupp
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Jameson
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Jones
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lewis
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Lis
Terminated: 01/24/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James George, Moses Linen, Kimberly Neely, Roosevelt Gatterson, Melodie Golde, Zhishen Hu, Carzell Hunter, Rose Lunsford, John Meyer, Lakeycia Pope, Watson Riley, Hattie Street, Ashely White, Joanne Bove, Laura Martuscello, Tanganeeka Buxton, Cesar Cortes, Ermelinda Cortes, Marjorie Dorsaint, Binor Faison, John Griffiths, Dion Kimbrough, Ashley Maroney, Thomas Palmer, Matthew Prokaosch, Silverio Sabatino, Laiunia Wheeler, Averri Albert, Danelle Avellino, Urusla Brewer, James Bynum, Patrick Conaway, Leslie Geter, Otis Herren, Richard Kauffman, Donnell Lee, Angelique Marsh, Jason Pickens, Charlie Kanayurak, Robert Nienhaus Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/28 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carl Brown, Jim Dmeleo, Eric Johnson, Daniel Lautaret, Peter Truxillo, John Andrews, Lee Crews, Larry Fletcher, Steven Kennedy, Ramon Montoya, Abel Moreno, Daniel Richards, Bruce Shinabarger, Robert Thomas, Dale Bourgeois, William Swapp Jr., Jose Tellez, Timothy Watts, Michael Womack, Patrick Allen, Mica Calfee, William Keefe, Taunis Nielsen, Carolyn Crisp, Gerard Cook, Randall Hale, John Kendall, George Weeks, Kenneth Crouch, Earl Hoal, Paul Hollis, Eric Houston, William Lademann, Gregg Noury, Michael Schaffer, Donald Crook, Ernie Huizar, James Paulk, Ramond Williams, Caulin Delaney, Kristen Delaney, Kristen Delaney, Sean Delaney, Edward Hanlon, Tracey Hanlon, Tracey Hanlon, Laura Pease, Leslie Pease, Matthew Pease, Meredith Pease, Meredith Pease Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/28 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kendall W. Brock, Glynn Hawley, Lonnie Ellis, Neal Jameson, Ronald Jones, Lars Martin Maeland, Walter Nord, Mark Riley, Jerry Smith, Derek Strand, Michael Duplechain, Edwin Apgar, Earl Crawford, Pierre De Shaw, Brooke Denton, Ross Haynes, Tyrone Kelly Jr, Kim Krawczyk, Davis Lenz, Danny Leverette, James McClanahan, Calvin Mullins, Marissa Pacheco, Lillie Richardson, Nolan Schuler, Donald Veal, Delbert Wait, Ralph Johnson, Kenneth Kilgore, Sebastian Rice, Terry Tate, Harold Taylor, Rayshawn Allen, Clinton Martin, Randall Watts, Rachel Graci, Jeffrey Klein, Bobby Tillery, Glenn Bozant, Quincy Cormier, James L Ford Jr., Robert Herring, Cecil Ingram, Sidonna Kuhn, Gregory Manning, William Milton, Victor Osorio, Rick Rigney, Christopher Strobel Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary Sallinger without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Sallinger, Gary, Turney, Robery, Barnes, Randi, Miller, William, Street, John, Murphy, Kevin, Gasper Jr, Rudulph, Lake, Ralph D, Marigny, Frank, Stewart, Junious, Young, Donald, Murry Jr., Louis, Beasley, Anne, Perez, Nydia, Cortez Jr, Pedro, Oatis, Danny, Walker, James A, Watson, Barry, Berfield, Dean, Coats, John, Ellsworth II, Richard, Smith, Jeffery, Cooper, Dale, Tibbs, David, Green, KennethAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/24 12:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cora Adams, Joey Adams, Theresa Austin, Gregory Blanchard, Reginald Braxton, Randolph Bryant, David Bursiaga, Wayne Charles, Pedro Cortez Jr., Debby Farrar, Lonnie Ellis, John Fick, Gary Garrett, Tomas Gonzalez, Patrick Gouthro, Thomas Hallmark, Clyde Holliday, Patrick Hupp, Neal Jameson, Ronald Jones, Gary Lewis, Alan Lis, Lewis Love, Lars Martin Maeland, Patrick McIntyre, Marvin McKeever, Jose Melendez, Shane Miller, Walter Nord, Danny Oatis, Nathan Owen, Jerry Smith, Stephen Courtemanche, Derek Strand, Harvey Szczepan, Edwin Troxel, Peter Truxillo, Wanda Vazquez, James Walker, Barry Watson, Brandon Watson, Thomas J. Gentile, Ervin Wright, Michael House, Cory Shaw, Bruce Smith, Cleveland McGuire, Annmarie Weimer, Donald Young.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs Subject to Dismissal | ||
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:22-cv-07731, Lemke et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3474-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 10/07 2:58 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-07731. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/7/2022.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Fri 10/07 12:52 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina (vba) |
||
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 10/07 3:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:22-cv-07731, Lemke et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3474-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/07 12:51 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/22/2022) (vba) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 3M Company, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours Inc., E. I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., The Chemours Company, Tyco Fire Products, LP, Debby Ferrar, Stephen Courtrmanche. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/7/2022.] | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/7/2022.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/7/2022.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/7/2022.] | ||
Friday, September 09, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/7/2022.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/7/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26659168).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/7/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint |