Shiraef v. Ameristar Casino Black Hawk, LLC et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Gordon P Gallagher |
Referred: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-02638 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2023 5:07 AM MDT |
Defendant
Ameristar Casino Black Hawk, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Black Hawk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gaming and Leisure Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Whitman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Whitman (I)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Shiraef
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
148 | 148
order
Order on Motion for Order
Mon 08/26 12:54 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 8/26/2024, granting137 First Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Abraham F. Carpio. Mr. Carpio is no longer counsel for Plaintiff and shall be removed from the ECF distribution list for the case. Plaintiff continues to be represented by Harris S. Ammerman. Because the Motion to Withdraw does not contain a certification that the Motion was served upon Plaintiff as required by D.COLO.LAttyR 5(b), Mr. Ammerman shall serve upon Plaintiff a copy of this Order and the First Motion to Withdraw. Text Only Entry(sbplc4) |