WEEMS v. CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gerald J Pappert |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03961 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2023 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
PAULETTE MATTHEWS
|
|
Defendant
NOA GLICK
|
|
Defendant
DUANE GREY
|
|
Defendant
HELGE HARTHUNG
|
|
Defendant
LENA HAYES
|
|
Defendant
JODI HOULON
|
|
Defendant
JONATHAN HOULON
|
|
Defendant
INTERCOMMUNITY ACTION/GREENRIDGE COUNSELING
|
|
Defendant
TRUDY JOHNSON
|
|
Defendant
BENITA KING
|
|
Defendant
AMANDA KUMAR
|
|
Defendant
MICHELLE LAMBERT
|
|
Defendant
ALEISHA LOMAX
|
|
Defendant
HONORABLE JUDGE MARTINEZ
|
|
Defendant
MORGAN GERHART
|
|
Defendant
JOANNE MINERVA
|
|
Defendant
MARGARET T MURPHY
|
|
Defendant
OFFICE OF THE CITY SOLICITORS
|
|
Defendant
WALTER J. OLSZEWSKI
|
|
Defendant
PHILA. COUNTY COURT JUDGES VINCENT W. FURLONG
|
|
Defendant
PHILA. LAW DEPT.
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM RUSSELL
|
|
Defendant
KHADRA SEALES
|
|
Defendant
CLEARANCE TERPLAY
|
|
Defendant
NURSE GINA WEAL
|
|
Defendant
GINA WEAL
|
|
Defendant
ERICA G WILLIAMS
|
|
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
|
|
Defendant
ACS MCLAUGHLIN
|
|
Defendant
RSRI DENISE ANTROM
|
|
Defendant
ATA INTRERACT
|
|
Defendant
BEHAVIORAL HEALTH FORENSIC EVAL CENTER
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN BELL
|
|
Defendant
C.H.O.P MADELINE BELL
|
|
Defendant
KATHLEEN K BOLA
|
|
Defendant
CIERA BRADSHER
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER BRENTON
|
|
Defendant
CHILD ADVOCATE CURLEY ANTELL
|
|
Defendant
CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PHILADELPHIA
|
|
Defendant
CITY OF PHILA DHS DOCTOR FOOTE
|
|
Defendant
CM CARSON VALLEY CHILD
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER COLE
|
|
Defendant
CAROLINE B CURLEY
|
|
Defendant
MICHELLE DAVIS
|
|
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
|
|
Defendant
DHS COMMISSIONERS, CYNTHIA F. FIGUEROA, KIMBERLY ALI
|
|
Defendant
DHS CUA TURNING POINTS
|
|
Defendant
DENISE FITZPATRICK
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH FOOTE
|
|
Defendant
FORENIS MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE, LLC/ATA
|
|
Defendant
CHILD ATTORNEY LUE B FRIERSON
|
|
Defendant
CARLA N. GARDNER
|
|
Defendant
ASHLEY GARRISON
|
|
Plaintiff
MARGO A WEEMS
AND HER CHILD TMW 5131 GREENE STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19144 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
132 | 132
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Fri 07/26 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michelle Amanda Michelson on behalf of NOA GLICK(PSYD)(Michelson, Michelle) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
131 | 131
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 7:50 AM
ORDER granting128 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/23/24.7/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
130 | 130
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Tue 07/23 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re129 Notice of Appeal filed by MARGO A WEEMS. USCA Case Number 24-2333 (dt) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
129 | 129
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 07/19 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by MARGO A WEEMS. *APPEAL IFP PENDING * (rf, ) |
|
128 | 128
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 1:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by MARGO A WEEMS..(rf, ) |