Dmeleo et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03484 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2022 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:22-cv-08223 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 09, 2023 4:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Ellsworth II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Maine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Lautaret
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Keys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Berfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Brown
3890 Secondloop Rd
Conway, SC 29526 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Dmeleo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Coats
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/28 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carl Brown, Jim Dmeleo, Eric Johnson, Daniel Lautaret, Peter Truxillo, John Andrews, Lee Crews, Larry Fletcher, Steven Kennedy, Ramon Montoya, Abel Moreno, Daniel Richards, Bruce Shinabarger, Robert Thomas, Dale Bourgeois, William Swapp Jr., Jose Tellez, Timothy Watts, Michael Womack, Patrick Allen, Mica Calfee, William Keefe, Taunis Nielsen, Carolyn Crisp, Gerard Cook, Randall Hale, John Kendall, George Weeks, Kenneth Crouch, Earl Hoal, Paul Hollis, Eric Houston, William Lademann, Gregg Noury, Michael Schaffer, Donald Crook, Ernie Huizar, James Paulk, Ramond Williams, Caulin Delaney, Kristen Delaney, Kristen Delaney, Sean Delaney, Edward Hanlon, Tracey Hanlon, Tracey Hanlon, Laura Pease, Leslie Pease, Matthew Pease, Meredith Pease, Meredith Pease Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary Sallinger without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Sallinger, Gary, Turney, Robery, Barnes, Randi, Miller, William, Street, John, Murphy, Kevin, Gasper Jr, Rudulph, Lake, Ralph D, Marigny, Frank, Stewart, Junious, Young, Donald, Murry Jr., Louis, Beasley, Anne, Perez, Nydia, Cortez Jr, Pedro, Oatis, Danny, Walker, James A, Watson, Barry, Berfield, Dean, Coats, John, Ellsworth II, Richard, Smith, Jeffery, Cooper, Dale, Tibbs, David, Green, KennethAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:22-cv-08223, Dmeleo et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3484-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 10/12 11:30 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-08223. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/7/2022) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: 3M Company. The party was added to the case in error (Duplicate Party). (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours Inc., E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC, Tyco Fire Products, LP. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 157012-2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26734964).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)[Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint |