Froner et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03536 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2022 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:22-cv-08224 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 10, 2023 6:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corp
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Tonoga, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
Erwin Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Bernier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamare Bacon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Holly Froner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Boomhouer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:22-cv-08224, Froner et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3536-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 10/12 6:50 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-08224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/7/2022) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | ||
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26734995).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial |