Jones v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03567 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 12, 2023 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Toussaint Jones
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Only, of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Jones v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3567-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Maryland (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/14 4:49 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/14 4:30 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10750472.), filed by Toussaint Jones. Service due by 1/12/2023(sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 10/14 5:17 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Jones v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3567-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Maryland (sshe, ) |