Quackenbush v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:22-cv-81607 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 16, 2023 6:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Rite Aid
|
|
Defendant
Walmart
|
|
Defendant
Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation
|
|
Plaintiff
Gerry Quackenbush
146 Argersinger Road
Fultonville, NY 12072 |
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 26, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee)
Wed 10/26 4:14 PM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 10/26/2022 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS258982. (vt) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Wed 10/26 3:53 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $402.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (kpe) |
||
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
order
Administrative Order
Fri 10/21 4:19 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. All pending motions are the above-listed cases are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the movant to comply with the procedures outlined in Pretrial Order # 24, paragraph 10. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re:1 Complaint filed by Gerry Quackenbush. Case not filed with required filing fees of $ 402.00, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a), and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Summons(es) will not be issued until the filing fee is paid or an order granting the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is entered. (pes) | |
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) | |
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/19 9:01 AM
SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 NOT PAID/NO IFP, filed by Gerry Quackenbush.(pes) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 10/19 9:05 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
||
notice
Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency
Wed 10/19 9:06 AM
Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re:1 Complaint filed by Gerry Quackenbush. Case not filed with required filing fees of $ 402.00, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a), and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Summons(es) will not be issued until the filing fee is paid or an order granting the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is entered. (pes) |