Teal Properties, Inc. v. Dog House Investments, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-12203
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-12203
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 4:22-ap-01024 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dog House Investments, LLC
4300 Sidco Drive, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37204 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teal Properties, Inc.
185 Deer Park Ct
Manchester, TN 37355 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 06/12 7:48 AM
Adversary Case 4:22-ap-1024 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 06/12 7:47 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:22-ap-1024. (cfy) |
||
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Mon 12/19 8:41 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Steven L. Lefkovitz on behalf of Plaintiff Teal Properties, Inc..(Lefkovitz, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
court
Hearing Held (BK)
Mon 12/19 1:51 PM
Hearing Held (sal) |
||
Thursday, December 08, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 12/08 4:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by J. Brad Scarbrough on behalf of Defendant Dog House Investments, LLC. (Scarbrough, J.) |
|
Sunday, November 20, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 11/21 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/20/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Set Hearing
Fri 11/18 1:30 PM
Order Scheduling Status Conference . Status Conference scheduled 12/19/2022 at 09:30 AM at Second Floor Courtroom, U. S. Courthouse, Winchester, TN. (mnj) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 11/09 11:08 AM
Receipt of Notice of Removal([LINK:4:22-ap-01024-NWW] ) [cmp,ntcrmvl] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22866952. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/26 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Steven L. Lefkovitz on behalf of Plaintiff Teal Properties, Inc. . (Lefkovitz, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Wed 10/26 8:25 AM
Summons Issued on Dog House Investments, LLC. Date Issued 10/26/2022, Answer Due 11/25/2022. (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Tue 10/25 4:49 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Plaintiff Teal Properties, Inc. (Lefkovitz, Steven) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Supplemental Document
Mon 10/24 4:59 PM
Supplemental Document Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Steven L. Lefkovitz on behalf of Plaintiff Teal Properties, Inc.. (Lefkovitz, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 10/24 4:35 PM
Adversary case 4:22-ap-01024. Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Bankruptcy Court by Teal Properties, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))(Lefkovitz, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Chancery Court Complaint |