Flexiworld Technologies Inc v. Hisense Co., Ltd. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Grimberg |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-04337 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Texas Eastern, 2:22-cv-00225 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 29, 2023 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hisense USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Hisense Electronics Manufacturing Company of America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hisense International Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD.
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hisense International America Holdings Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd.
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V.
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hisense Company, Ltd.
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 09/06/2022
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hisense Electronics Manufacturing Company of America Corporation
Terminated: 03/07/2023
|
|
Plaintiff
Hisense USA Corporation
Terminated: 03/07/2023
|
Docket last updated: 07/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 06/07 3:53 PM
ORDER: The Court, having considered the44 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, GRANTS the Motion in its entirety. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims in this matter are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 06/07/2023. (tht) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/24 1:28 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc..(Grochocinski, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/07 11:44 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties are ORDERED to file documents to dispose of the case within 60 days of the date of this Order. Absent an extension of that deadline or further order of the Court, if no request to reopen the case is made within 60 days, the case will be considered DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE at that time. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/7/2023. (ane) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/07 11:46 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 03/22 9:50 AM
Remark: The Court is considering consolidating the following three actions pending in this district: Case Nos. 1:22-cv-04337-SDG, 1:22-cv-04338-SDG, and 1:22-cv-04371-SDG. The parties are ORDERED to notify the Court of its position on consolidation within 7 days of this Order. The Clerk is instructed to resubmit this Order to undersigned in 7 days. (slc) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 03/22 1:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extending Responsive Pleading Deadlines. The Court ORDERS that the Pre-existing Hisense Defendants shall have through and including 4/11/2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/21/2023. (tas) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 03/20 11:17 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extending Responsive Pleading Deadlines by Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V., Hisense Electronics Manufacturing Company of America Corporation, Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd., and Hisense USA Corporation.(Klein, Linda) Modified on 3/20/2023 to edit text at request of attorney (lwb) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 03/08 9:39 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Hisense Electronics Manufacturing Company of America Corporation, and Hisense USA Corporation. (aaq) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
service
Proposed Summons
Tue 03/07 6:50 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(Grochocinski, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
38 | 38
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/07 6:21 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc..(Grochocinski, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex_1_US9965233, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex_2_US11029903, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex_3_Flexi_Notice_Letter_Hisense_10.14.21, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex_4_Flexi_Supp_Notice_Letter_Hisense_12.29.21_, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex_5_233_Chart, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex_6_903_Chart | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/10 9:52 PM
ORDER granting31 Application for Admission of Matthew C. Bernstein, Pro Hac Vice by direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 01/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc) |
||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/10 9:54 PM
ORDER granting32 Application of Patrick J. McKeever for Admission Pro Hac Vice by direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVAL by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 01/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc) |
||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/10 9:57 PM
ORDER granting29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy E. Grochocinski by direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 01/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc) |
||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/10 9:59 PM
ORDER granting28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of C. Austin Ginnings. APPROVAL by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 01/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc) |
||
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 12/27 1:47 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint36 . The deadline for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint is hereby extended until March 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/27/2022. (gas) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/21 6:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc..(Grochocinski, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 12/01 1:52 PM
ORDER granting Joint Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadlines34 . The Court ORDERS that the Hisense Defendants do not have to respond to the existing complaint (Dkt. 1) and shall have through and including January 27, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's forthcoming amended complaint, which shall be filed no later than January 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/30/2022. (gas) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 11/29 5:56 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Forthcoming Amended Complaint re:1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd..(Klein, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Mon 11/28 3:45 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:32 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick J. McKeever Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12214852).. Attorney Patrick McKeever added appearing on behalf of Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. (pdt) |
||
Friday, November 25, 2022 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Fri 11/25 4:22 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:31 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew C. Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12214833).. Attorney Matthew C Bernstein added appearing on behalf of Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. (kkh) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/22 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Schneider Tucker on behalf of Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. (Tucker, Kristin) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/22 1:21 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick J. McKeever Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12214852).by Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd..(Klein, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/22 1:18 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew C. Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12214833).by Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd..(Klein, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/22 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Ann Klein on behalf of Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. (Klein, Linda) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Wed 11/16 12:56 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:28 APPLICATION for Admission of C. Austin Ginnings Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12196444). Attorney Charles Austin Ginnings added appearing on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (cdg) |
||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Wed 11/16 2:26 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:29 APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy E. Grochocinski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12196461). Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski added appearing on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (cdg) |
||
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/14 3:58 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy E. Grochocinski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12196461).by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Hill, Steven) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/14 3:55 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of C. Austin Ginnings Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12196444).by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Hill, Steven) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/14 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Nixon Mahaffey on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Mahaffey, John) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/14 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Hill on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Hill, Steven) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter re:83.1
Thu 11/10 1:09 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Timothy E. Grochocinski. Clerk to follow-up by 11/21/2022. (pdt) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Letter re:83.1
Thu 11/10 1:08 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Charles Austin Ginnings. Clerk to follow-up by 11/21/2022. (pdt) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Letter re:83.1
Thu 11/10 1:04 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Matthew C Bernstein. Clerk to follow-up by 11/21/2022. (pdt) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 10/31 3:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00225. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Remark
Mon 10/31 4:16 PM
Civil Action Number 1:22-cv-4337 opened under 1:22-cv-4338 in error (aar) |
||
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER granting20 Agreed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia and Cancel Scheduling Conference. Court hereby TRANSFERS the above- captioned case to the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2022. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
20 | 20 Agreed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia and Cancel Scheduling Conference by Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd..(Bernstein, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER granting17 Sealed Document Stipulation to Dismissal without prejudice as to Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is, HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Hisense Co., Ltd., Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V., Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd., Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,, QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD. and Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/6/2022. (ch, ) Modified on 9/9/2022 (klc, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
18 | 18 REDACTION to17 Sealed Document Stipulation of Dismissal of Specified Defendants Without Prejudice by QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd., Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is, HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Hisense Co., Ltd., Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V., Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd., Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd., QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,. (Bernstein, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
17 | 17 Sealed Document. Stipulation of Dismissal of Specified Defendants Without Prejudice(Bernstein, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 31, 2022 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER granting in part15 Joint MOTION To Reschedule Scheduling Or, In The Alternative, Extend Deadlines. Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/31/2022. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
15 | 15 Joint MOTION To Reschedule Scheduling Or, In The Alternative, Extend Deadlines by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc..(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14 ***FILED IN ERROR SEE # 15*** Joint MOTION To Reschedule Scheduling Or, In The Alternative, Extend Deadlines Certificate of Conference by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) Modified on 8/31/2022 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
13 | 13 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT*** Joint MOTION To Reschedule Scheduling Or, In The Alternative, Extend Deadlines by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc..(Grochocinski, Timothy) Modified on 8/30/2022 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 13 submitted NEEDS CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, August 17, 2022 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2022. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER granting10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/4/2022. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD. to 12/3/2022; Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is to 12/3/2022; HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD. to 12/3/2022; Hisense Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V. to 12/3/2022; Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense International Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD., to 12/3/2022. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
10 | 10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd., Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is, HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Hisense Co., Ltd., Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V., Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd., Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd., QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,.(Bernstein, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
8 | 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd..(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Summons(es) Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd. | ||
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
4 | 4 SUMMONS Issued as to QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd., Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is, HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Hisense Co., Ltd., Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V., Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd., Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd., QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,.(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 2 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 3 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 4 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 5 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 6 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 7 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 8 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 9 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 10 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 11 Summons(es) | ||
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Austin Ginnings on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Ginnings, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
2 | 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
1 | 1 14 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8990704.), filed by Flexiworld Technology Inc..(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit AO 120 | ||
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] | ||
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] |