Madden v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03814 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2023 7:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Madden
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 03, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Reissued
Thu 11/03 2:18 PM
Summons Reissued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from 2:22-cv-3445-RMG to 2:22-cv-3814-RMG. (asni, ) | |
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 10/5/2022), Barbara Madden v. 3M et al, as DSC case (original case number 2:22-cv-3445-RMG) changed to 2:22-cv-03814-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Arizona (sshe, ) Modified on 11/3/2022 clerk's note: case number changed for clerical purpose only (sshe, ). | |
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) | |
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10735387.), filed by Barbara Madden. Service due by 1/3/2023(sshe, ) (Main Document 1 replaced to correct case number on 11/3/2022) (sshe, ). Modified on 11/3/2022 clerk's note: case number changed (sshe, ). |