David Wilson v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al
Original Case: 2:22-cv-01647
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-03070 |
Type | civil / united states as party / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 02, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 30, 2022 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant
USA PRESIDENT STEVE WILSON
|
|
Defendant
USA PRESIDENT GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ
|
|
Defendant
USA PRESIDENT STUART RABNER
|
|
Defendant
USA PRESIDENT SHEILA Y. OLIVER
|
|
Defendant
USA PRESIDENT MARC MCKITHEN
|
|
Defendant
USA PRESIDENT MICHAEL HARPER
|
|
Defendant
USA PRESIDENT KENNETH S DOUGLAS
|
|
Defendant
USA PRESIDENT VIC CARSTARPHEN
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
JUSTICE STUART RABNER, New Jersey Supreme Court Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL HARPER, Camden City Fire Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ, Camden County Police Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
VIC CARSTARPHEN, Camden City Mayor
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
KENNETH S DOUGLAS, Trenton Fire Commissioner
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE WILSON, Trenton Police Commissioner
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARC MCKITHEN, Trenton Municipal Court Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
SHEILA Y. OLIVER, New Jersey Lieutenant Governor
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL A. SHIPP, USA District Court Judge
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN ROBERTS, USA Supreme Court Chief Justice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
VICE PRESIDENT KAMALA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
USA PRESIDENT JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
USA PRESIDENT JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
USA PRESIDENT KAMALA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
USA PRESIDENT JOHN ROBERTS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
USA PRESIDENT MICHAEL A. SHIPP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID ALLEN WILSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/30/2022 3:30 AM EST |
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TNH) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant David Allen Wilson in District Court No. 2-22-cv-01647. (TNH) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Caption | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |