Endoceutics Pharma (MSH) Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:22-bk-11641
Lead case is: 1:22-bk-11641
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 15 | |
Judge: | Christopher J Panos |
Case #: | 1:22-bk-11643 |
Case Filed: | Nov 11, 2022 |
Debtor
Endoceutics Pharma (MSH) Inc.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago |
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
court
Substitute UST
Fri 06/30 12:09 PM
Due to the retirement of Assistant U.S. Trustee John P. Fitzgerald on June 30, 2023, the Court will replace his appearance in this case with that of Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard T. King. (efg) |
||
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion For Joint Administration
Mon 11/14 11:58 AM
Order dated 11/14/2022 Re:2 Motion filed by Debtor Endoceutics Pharma (MSH) Inc. for Joint Administration with Cases # 22-11641 22-11642 22-11644 22-11645 GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (jr) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 11/14 9:20 AM
Motion filed by Debtor Endoceutics Pharma (MSH) Inc. for Joint Administration with Case # 22-11641 22-11642 22-11644 22-11645 (Monaghan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration | ||
Friday, November 11, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15)
Fri 11/11 6:36 PM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Endoceutics Pharma (MSH) Inc.. (Monaghan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended and Restated Initial Order |