Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joel H Slomsky
Case #: 2:22-cv-04540
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2022
Terminated:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 09, 2023 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
CLIFTON HEIGHTS POLICE DEPARTMENT
Defendant
OFFICER DUNCAN SMITH
Defendant
OFFICER DANIEL MCGONIGAL
Defendant
Interim Director DHS ANGELIQUE HIERS
Defendant
MEGAN FULTON
Defendant
SHAPIRO DOE
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Defendant
COUNTY OF DELAWARE
Defendant
NICOLE STROFE
Defendant
MYKIA HICKS
Defendant
JOAN BAXTER
Plaintiff
IFEANYI NWANI
Individually 325 E. BALTIMORE AVENUE APT A
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19018
Plaintiff
D. S.
Plaintiff
K. S.
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
NASIRA SMITH
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Defendant
TIANNA O'CONNOR
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Defendant
BERNARD NESMITH
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Defendant
HILLCREST ELEMENTARY SCHOOL
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY CHILDREN & YOUTH SERVICES
Terminated: 02/23/2023

GPO Feb 28 2023
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 02/28/2023. 02/28/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
GPO Feb 28 2023
ORDER THAT THE LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO 3) IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND SECOND AND THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINTS ARE DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO MARK AS PARTICIPANT VIEW ONLY ECF NOS. 2, 1, 3 AND 5; THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO CORRECT THE DOCKET TO REFLECT THE PARTIES NAMED IN THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED AS OUTLINED HEREIN; THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE ANGELIQUE HIERS AND THE DELAWARE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES AS DEFENDANTS; NWAMI MAY FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO MAIL A COPY OF THE BLANK STANDARD FORM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 02/28/2023. 02/28/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
GPO Jul 17 2023
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/17/23. 7/17/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
GPO Jul 17 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT NWANI'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/17/23. 7/17/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
GPO Mar 19 2024
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/19/24. 3/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
GPO Mar 19 2024
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS NICOLE STROFE, MYKIA HICKS, AND MEGAN FULTONS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT 22 AND PLAINTIFF IFEANYI NWANIS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION 23, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT 22 IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/19/24. 3/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Tue 03/19 3:45 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS NICOLE STROFE, MYKIA HICKS, AND MEGAN FULTONS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT22 AND PLAINTIFF IFEANYI NWANIS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION23 , IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT22 IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/19/24. 3/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
31 31 15 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Tue 03/19 3:43 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/19/24. 3/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Thu 03/14 3:44 PM
Letter dated 3/14/24 by MEGAN FULTON, MYKIA HICKS, NICOLE STROFE (FILED UNDER SEAL) (lvj) (lvj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/14/2024) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT
29 29 misc Letter Thu 03/14 1:53 PM
Letter dated 03/14/24 by MEGAN FULTON, MYKIA HICKS, NICOLE STROFE. (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
28 28 misc Letter Wed 03/13 1:55 PM
Plaintiff's Letter of Record Updating Status by IFEANYI NWANI (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
27 27 order Status Report Order Tue 03/12 2:23 PM
ORDER THAT THE MARCH 11, 2024 ORDER26 IS VACATED AND THE FOLLOWING ORDER IS ENTERED IN THIS CASE PLAINTIFF IFEANYI NWANI AND/OR COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE IN THIS CASE A LETTER OF RECORD BY MARCH 15, 2024 UPDATING THIS COURT ON THE STATUS OF AND/OR PROCEEDINGS IN THE TWO CASES IN THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF DELAWARE COUNTY PENNSYLVANIA, CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES DIVISION (CASE NOS. CP-23-DP-056-2015, CP-23-DP-057-2015) AND THE PLACEMENT OF K.S. AND D.S. BASED ONLY ON DOCUMENTS FILED OF RECORD ON THE DOCKETS OF THE TWO CASES. PLAINTIFF AND/OR COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS MAY ATTACH TO THE LETTER FILED OF RECORD IN THIS CASE THE DOCUMENTS FILED OF RECORD IN THE TWO CASES IN THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES DIVISION. THE MINORS SHALL BE REFERRED TO IN THE LETTER ONLY AS K.S. AND D.S. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/12/24. 3/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
26 26 order Status Report Order Mon 03/11 1:27 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IFEANYI NWANI AND/OR COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS SHALL UPDATE THE COURT ON THE STATUS OF THE TWO CASES IN THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF DELAWARE COUNTY PENNSYLVANIA, CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES DIVISION (CASE NOS. CP-23-DP-056-2015, CP-23-DP-057-2015) AND THE PLACEMENT OF K.S. AND D.S. BY FILING A LETTER OF RECORD BY MARCH 15, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/11/24. 3/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
25 25 trial Exhibit Fri 12/08 8:02 PM
EXHIBIT 2. (va)
Related: [-]
24 24 trial Exhibit Fri 12/08 8:02 PM
EXHIBIT 1. (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/17 3:18 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM22 filed by IFEANYI NWANI. (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/16 9:38 AM
DEFENDANTS STROFE, HICKS AND FULTON'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed by MEGAN FULTON, MYKIA HICKS, NICOLE STROFE, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(lvj) (lvj). (lvj). (lvj). (lvj). (lvj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/16/2023) Memorandum SEALED MEMO,
Att: 2 (8/16/2023) Text of Proposed Order SEALED PROPOSED ORDER,
Att: 3 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 4 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 5 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 6 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 7 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT
Att: 8 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 9 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 10 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 11 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 12 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT
Att: 13 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 14 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 15 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 16 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 17 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT
Att: 18 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 19 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 20 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 21 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 22 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT
Att: 23 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 24 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 25 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 26 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 27 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT,
Att: 28 (8/16/2023) Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT
Friday, August 11, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/11 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL F. SCHLEIGH on behalf of MEGAN FULTON, MYKIA HICKS, NICOLE STROFE with Certificate of Service(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Tue 08/01 6:53 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL7 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/31/23.8/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/31 10:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by IFEANYI NWANI re: U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE served Summons and Complaint upon MEGAN FULTON by S/C. MEGAN FULTON served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (bw)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/31 10:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by IFEANYI NWANI re: U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE served Summons and Complaint upon MYKIA HICKS by S/C. MYKIA HICKS served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (bw)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/31 10:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by IFEANYI NWANI re: U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE served Summons and Complaint upon NICOLE STROFE by S/C. NICOLE STROFE served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 07/26 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by IFEANYI NWANI(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
15 15 misc US Marshal Return Wed 07/19 9:12 AM
US Marshal Return. Initial Notice Mailed 7/19/2023. (bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
14 14 service Summons Issued Mon 07/17 2:36 PM
Summons Issued as to MEGAN FULTON, MYKIA HICKS, NICOLE STROFE. Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal Service, Nwani on 7/17/23 (fdc)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 07/17 1:43 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT NWANI'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/17/23. 7/17/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
12 12 9 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 07/17 1:40 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/17/23. 7/17/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/27 10:35 AM
FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by K. S., IFEANYI NWANI, D. S..(bw)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/27 10:34 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by IFEANYI NWANI..(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
misc Remark Wed 03/01 9:04 AM
MAILED OUT NON-PRISONER COMPLAINT FORM TO PLAINTIFF ON 3/1/23. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
9 9 3 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Tue 02/28 3:51 PM
ORDER THAT THE LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO3 ) IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND SECOND AND THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINTS ARE DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO MARK AS PARTICIPANT VIEW ONLY ECF NOS.2 ,1 ,3 AND5 ; THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO CORRECT THE DOCKET TO REFLECT THE PARTIES NAMED IN THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED AS OUTLINED HEREIN; THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE ANGELIQUE HIERS AND THE DELAWARE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES AS DEFENDANTS; NWAMI MAY FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO MAIL A COPY OF THE BLANK STANDARD FORM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 02/28/2023. 02/28/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
Related: [-]
8 8 18 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Tue 02/28 3:45 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 02/28/2023. 02/28/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
7 7 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 12/05 11:41 AM
Request For Appointment of Attorney filed by IFEANYI NWANI, TIANNA O'CONNOR, DASHAWN SMITH..(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/29 8:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by IFEANYI NWANI.(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/21 4:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by IFEANYI NWANI.(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/15 9:37 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOAN BAXTER, DELAWARE COUNTY CHILDREN & YOUTH SERVICES, MYKIA HICKS, HILLCREST ELEMENTARY SCHOOL, BERNARD NESMITH, TIANNA O'CONNOR, NASIRA SMITH, NICOLE STROFE, filed by DASHAWN SMITH, KASEEM SMITH, IFEANYI NWANI.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
3 3 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Mon 11/14 12:29 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 11/14 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against JOAN BAXTER, DELAWARE COUNTY CHILDREN & YOUTH SERVICES, MYKIA HICKS, HILLCREST ELEMENTARY SCHOOL, BERNARD NESMITH, TIANNA O'CONNOR, NASIRA SMITH, NICOLE STROFE, filed by DASHAWN SMITH, KASEEM SMITH, IFEANYI NWANI.(bw)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 11/14 12:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by IFEANYI NWANI, DASHAWN SMITH, KASEEM SMITH..(bw)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 11/14 2:55 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by IFEANYI NWANI, DASHAWN SMITH, KASEEM SMITH. (bw)
Related: [-]